VA HB2457 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abandoned and salvage vehicles; licensees; penalty. Removes from the definition of "abandoned motor vehicle" a motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer that (i) has remained unclaimed in a garage for more than 10 days or (ii) has remained unclaimed in a self-storage unit. The bill provides that any licensee who utilizes machinery to crush a vehicle must apply for a permit if such crushing occurs at a location not specified on the license. The bill also allows law-enforcement officials to examine salvage vehicles that have been repaired or rebuilt for highway use and updates penalties for any violations by licensees.
Title
Abandoned and salvage vehicles; revises definition, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2457ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2457ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103885D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2457E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103885D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |