VA HB2457 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health and Human Resources Secretariat; single state agency for data collection and sharing; report. Requires that, as requested by the Secretary of Health and Human Resources and to the extent authorized by federal law, the agencies of the Secretariat of Health and Human Resources shall share data, records, and information about applicants for and recipients of services from the agencies of the Secretariat, including individually identifiable health information for the purposes of (i) streamlining administrative processes and reducing administrative burdens on the agencies, (ii) reducing paperwork and administrative burdens on the applicants and recipients, and (iii) improving access to and quality of services provided by the agencies. The bill requires the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to report on the implementation of the provisions of the bill by October 1, 2017.
Title
Health and Human Resources Secretariat; agencies of Secretariat shall share data, records, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2457ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2457H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104758D-H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104758D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104476D |