VA HB2481 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; authorize localities to opt out of group insurance program. Authorizes a locality that participates in the Virginia Retirement System to opt out of the group insurance program and instead establish, either by self-funding or purchasing insurance, local life insurance coverage or accidental death and dismemberment insurance. Under current law, if a locality participates in the group insurance program, it is prohibited from withdrawing.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; authorizes localities to opt out of group insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102983D |