VA HB2482 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Land preservation tax credits; operation of facility on donated land; agreements between the Commonwealth and a third party related to donated land. Provides that if Virginia or one of its political subdivisions operates a facility on land donated for a land preservation tax credit, including charging fees for the use of such facility, such operation of a facility shall not disqualify the donation from eligibility for the credit, so long as any fees are used for conservation or preservation purposes. The bill provides that if Virginia or one of its political subdivisions contracts with a third party to manage a facility on donated land, such agreement shall not disqualify the donation from eligibility for the credit, so long as such agreement is for conservation or preservation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land preservation tax credits; operation of facility on donated land, third party agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 649 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2482ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseReported from Finance (21-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100278D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581512(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback