VA HB2483 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credit for donation to public access authority. Establishes for taxable years 2019 through 2023 a nonrefundable income tax credit in the amount of 40 percent of a donation to a public access authority. A credit would be allowed only for a donation to a public access authority that owns an aggregate of at least 200 acres of real property located on a waterfront and available for use by the general public The amount of credit claimed per year shall not exceed $20,000, but unused credit may be carried forward for three years. The aggregate amount of available credits is limited to $5 million per year.
Title
Income tax, state; credit for donation to public access authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100323D |