VA HB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Annual retail sales and use tax holiday. Establishes an annual retail sales and use tax holiday that takes place on the first full weekend in August beginning on July 1, 2025, through July 1, 2030. During such weekend, state retail sales and use tax will not apply to certain (i) school supplies, (ii) clothing and footwear, (iii) qualified products designated as Energy Star or WaterSense, (iv) portable generators, or (v) hurricane preparedness equipment.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; establishes an annual tax holiday that takes place in August.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/25) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB25ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 24100105D-E |
2024-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB25E |
2024-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100105D |
Same As/Similar To
HB138 (Similar To) 2024-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/25)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/25)