VA HB2531 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health Insurance Premium Payment program; enrollment of eligible individuals. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to enroll in the Health Insurance Premium Payment program every person who is eligible for medical assistance services provided pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance services and who has a household income that is equal to or greater than 100 percent of the federal poverty level for a household the size of such person's household and meets the criteria for enrollment in such program unless enrolling the person in such program is determined not to be cost effective.
Title
Health Insurance Premium Payment program; enrollment of eligible individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101350D |