VA HB2602 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board established. Establishes as an independent advisory board in state government an 11-member Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board, consisting of the President of Virginia Commonwealth University or his designee, the Vice President for Health Sciences at Virginia Commonwealth University or his designee, the President of the University of Virginia or his designee, the Executive Vice President for Health Affairs at the University of Virginia or his designee, one representative of Eastern Virginia Medical School, one representative of Virginia Tech Carilion School of Medicine and Research Institute, and five other nonlegislative citizen members, to study the requirements for designation as a consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center by the National Cancer Institute and make recommendations to Virginia Commonwealth University and the University of Virginia relating to the process for establishing a joint National Cancer Institute-designated consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center, including recommendations relating to a joint leadership structure, research integration, and programmatic integration. The provisions of the bill sunset on July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consortium Comprehensive Cancer Center Advisory Board; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateLeft in Rules
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19101696D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2313139(n/a)See Bill Text
2313144(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback