VA HB2605 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Community corrections alternative program; establishment. Repeals the boot camp incarceration program, diversion center incarceration program, and detention center incarceration program established and maintained by the Department of Corrections and replaces them with the community corrections alternative program that will be established and maintained by the Department of Corrections for probationers and parolees whose identified risks and needs cannot be addressed by conventional probation or parole supervision. The program shall include components for providing access to counseling, substance abuse testing and treatment, remedial education, and career and occupational assessment; providing assistance in securing and maintaining employment; ensuring compliance with terms and conditions of probation or parole; ensuring restitution and performance of community service; payment of fines and costs of court; and providing other programs that will assist the probationer or parolee in returning to society as a productive citizen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community corrections alternative program; establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 618 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2605ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19102199D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192298.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192316.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192316.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192316.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192316.4(n/a)See Bill Text
462357(n/a)See Bill Text
462391(n/a)See Bill Text
53110(n/a)See Bill Text
53167.1(n/a)See Bill Text
53167.6(n/a)See Bill Text
53167.7(n/a)See Bill Text
53167.8(n/a)See Bill Text
53167.9(n/a)See Bill Text
602219(n/a)See Bill Text
602618(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback