VA HB2689 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Livestock definition; alpaca. Adds animals of the genus Vicugna, which includes alpacas, to the definition of "livestock" in the Domestic Animals law. Under current law, the definition includes animals of the genus Lama, which includes llamas but does not include alpacas.
Title
Livestock; changes definition to include alpacas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2689ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19105641D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2689S1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105641D-S1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105641D-S1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103655D |