VA HB2697 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; retail competition. Shortens the period that a utility's customer who switches from an investor-owned electric utility to a licensed competing supplier is barred from returning as a customer of its utility from five years to 90 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; retail competition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 3-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19101633D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback