VA HB271 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB271
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards and comprehensive community colleges; compensation structure for adjunct instructors; credit-bearing and noncredit workforce credentials. Encourages local school boards and comprehensive communities colleges to enter into local or regional agreements for the establishment and implementation of a competitive compensation structure to recruit and retain adjunct instructors to be jointly compensated by the relevant school boards and colleges to prepare both high school students and college students to earn credit-bearing workforce credentials and noncredit workforce credentials, as that term is defined in relevant law. Local school boards and comprehensive community colleges; compensation structure for adjunct instructors; credit-bearing and noncredit workforce credentials. Encourages local school boards and comprehensive communities colleges to enter into local or regional agreements for the establishment and implementation of a competitive compensation structure to recruit and retain adjunct instructors to be jointly compensated by the relevant school boards and colleges to prepare both high school students and college students to earn credit-bearing workforce credentials and noncredit workforce credentials, as that term is defined in relevant law.
Title
School bds. & comprehensive community colleges, local; compensation structure for adjunct professor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB271H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 22105352D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee on Education amendments rejected |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105352D-H1 |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102709D |
Same As/Similar To
HB271 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
Subjects
Community Colleges
Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
School Boards
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
School Boards
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |