VA HB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Effect of divorce proceedings; transfer of matters to juvenile and domestic relations district court. Provides that after the entry of a decree of divorce a vinculo matrimonii the circuit court shall not (i) transfer a case for modification to the juvenile and domestic relations district court in the absence of a motion by either party or (ii) require a provision for transfer of matters for modification to the juvenile and domestic relations district court as a condition of entry of a decree of divorce a vinculo matrimonii. The bill modifies the provision allowing transfer of any matters covered by the divorce decree to a juvenile and domestic relations district court to add transfer to any circuit court that constitutes a more appropriate forum.
Title
Divorce proceedings; transfer of case for modification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB289ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y -0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB289H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105772D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105772D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103659D |