VA HB3 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requirement that certain injuries to children be reported. Adds athletic coaches, directors, or other persons aged 18 years or older employed by or volunteering with private sports organizations or teams and administrators or employees aged 18 years or older of public or private day camps, youth centers, and youth recreation programs to the list of persons required to report suspected child abuse or neglect to the Department of Social Services.
Title
Child abuse or neglect; athletic coaches, etc. of private sports teams required to report to DSS.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] |
Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 391 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100448D-E | |
2012-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB3E | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2011-11-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-11-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100448D |