VA HB316 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Recycling Development Center established; report. Establishes the Virginia Recycling Development Center for the purposes of furthering the development of markets and processing for recycled commodities and products, to be run by a Director appointed and supervised by the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources. The bill creates the Virginia Recycling Development Center Advisory Committee, establishes reporting requirements, and creates the Recycling Market Development Fund to be used to fund the Center. The bill requires the Advisory Committee to make recommendations on the sources of potential funding for and detailed qualifying uses of the Fund and report its recommendations to the Secretary no later than October 1, 2024. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2038. Virginia Recycling Development Center established; report. Establishes the Virginia Recycling Development Center for the purposes of furthering the development of markets and processing for recycled commodities and products, to be run by a Director appointed and supervised by the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources. The bill creates the Virginia Recycling Development Center Advisory Committee, establishes reporting requirements, and creates the Recycling Market Development Fund to be used to fund the Center. The bill requires the Advisory Committee to make recommendations on the sources of potential funding for and detailed qualifying uses of the Fund and report its recommendations to the Secretary no later than October 1, 2024. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2038.
Title
Virginia Recycling Development Center; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2024-03-09 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Pekarsky, Williams Graves, Stuart |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Bulova, Tran, Runion |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108643D-S2 (1-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB316S2 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Finance and Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 24108643D-S2 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee substitute rejected 24108386D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108643D-S2 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108386D-S1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB316H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106658D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106658D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102588D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1425.40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1425.43 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |