VA HB319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Volunteer health care providers. Requires health regulatory boards to promulgate regulations providing for the satisfaction of board-required continuing education for individuals registered, certified, licensed, or issued a multistate licensure privilege by a health regulatory board through delivery of health care services, without compensation, to low-income individuals receiving health services through a local health department or a free clinic organized in whole or primarily for the delivery of those health services. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2017.
Title
Health regulatory boards; continuing education for certain individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 82 (effective 1/1/17) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB319ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB319H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104226D-H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104226D-H1 |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101102D |