VA HB322 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; summary suspension of license in emergency circumstances. Allows the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to temporarily suspend any license or permit if it has reasonable cause to believe that an act of violence resulting in death or serious bodily injury or reoccurrence of such acts has occurred on the licensed premises or other designated area and the Board finds that there exists a continuing threat to public safety and that summary suspension of the license or permit is justified to protect the health, safety, or welfare of the public. The bill sets up the process for initial and formal investigations and for a hearing and appeal for summary suspension. The bill does not apply to temporary licenses or permits, which may already be summarily suspended under current law, nor does it apply to holders of wholesale wine or beer licenses or holders of wine or beer importers licenses.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; summary suspension of license in emergency circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042) | |
2016-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 42 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2016 | |
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/19/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB322ER) |
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105521D-S1 (92-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB322S1 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105521D-S1 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105521D-S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB322H1 |
2016-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104481D-H1 |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104481D-H1 |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100645D |