VA HB323 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Bank franchise tax; apportionment. Provides that the bank franchise tax for banks operating in multiple states shall be apportioned according to the proportion of the bank's deposits held in the Commonwealth.
Title
Bank franchise tax; apportionment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102745D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB323 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB323+hil |