VA HB354 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Summary
Textbook purchasing contracts. Permits local school boards to enter into contracts with publishers for the purchase of textbooks. The bill (i) expands the definition of textbook to include print and electronic media; (ii) reorganizes the textbook purchasing process and repeals several sections of outdated Code; (iii) provides that if consumable materials are sold to students, the local school board must provide those materials at a reduced price, or free of charge, to students who are unable to afford them; and (iv) allows any private school to purchase from a local school board’s contract with the publisher, with the approval of both the local school board and the publisher.
Title
Textbook purchases; Board of Education shall publish list of approved textbooks, publisher, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB354ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-31 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB354H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083361468-H1 | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 083361468-H1 | |
2008-01-28 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088693468 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB354 |