VA HB356 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; political campaign advertisements. Requires that the State Board of Elections hold a public hearing when determining whether the chapter on political campaign advertisements has been violated and whether to assess a civil penalty. The Board is required to send notice by certified mail to persons whose actions will be reviewed and who may be subject to a civil penalty at least 10 days before the hearing. Notice shall include the date and time of the hearing, an explanation of the violation, and maximum assessable penalty.
Title
Campaign finance; print media requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB356ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB356H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104454D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104454D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101700D |