VA HB36 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disease prevention and control; Lyme disease. Adds Lyme disease to the list of diseases required to be reported to the Department of Health.
Title
Lyme disease; added to list of diseases required to be reported to Department of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2009-12-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2009-12-18 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100618D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB36 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB36+hil |