VA HB367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; publication of disciplinary offense and outcome data. Requires the Board of Education to annually publish disciplinary offense and outcome data by race, ethnicity, gender, and disability for each public school in the Commonwealth on its website.
Title
Education, Department of; shall annually publish disciplinary offense and outcome data.
Sponsors
Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB367ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB367H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104984D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104984D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101095D |