VA HB375 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Control of firearms by localities; workplace rules. Provides that no locality shall adopt any workplace rule, other than for the purposes of a community services board or behavioral health authority, that prevents an employee of that locality from storing at that locality's workplace a lawfully possessed firearm and ammunition in a locked private motor vehicle.
Title
Firearms; workplace rule by locality that prevents storing in locked motor vehicle, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 29-N) (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 12105585D-S2 (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 29-N) (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 12105585D-S2 (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB375ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 29-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (65-Y 29-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB375ER) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (71-Y 27-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conference substitute printed 12105999D-H1 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Delegates: Pogge, Merricks, Kory | |
2012-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Senators: Stanley, Reeves, Garrett | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-02 | House: House acceded to request | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 97-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-24 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB375S2 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 12105585D-S2 (25-Y 15-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105585D-S2 (Norment) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12105517D-S1 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105517D-S1 | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-02 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House (75-Y 25-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100430D-E | |
2012-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB375E | |
2012-02-01 | House: Amendments by Delegate Pogge agreed to | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-31 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100430D |