VA HB385 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Railroad safety; civil penalties. Requires a crew of at least two qualified individuals on all trains, locomotives, or light engines used in connection with moving freight.
Title
Railroad safety; use of train, locomotive, etc., for movement of freight, minimum train crew.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (50-Y 50-N) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (50-Y 50-N) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB385ER) |
2024-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (10-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed House (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Defeated (50-Y 50-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (50-Y 50-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB385H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106612D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106612D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102219D |
Same As/Similar To
SB143 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day