VA HB389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Offshore Wind Project Development Authority. Creates the Virginia Offshore Wind Development Authority to facilitate and support the development of the offshore wind industry and wind-powered electric energy facilities located off the coast of the Commonwealth beyond the Commonwealth's three-mile jurisdictional limit. The Authority is charged with, among other tasks, (i) identifying existing state and regulatory or administrative barriers to the development of the offshore wind industry, (ii) collecting metocean and environmental data, (iii) upgrading port facilities to accommodate the manufacturing and assembly of project components and vessels that will support such projects, and (iv) applying to the U.S. Department of Energy for loan guarantees for such projects.
Title
Virginia Offshore Wind Development Authority; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB389ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105720D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB389S1 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105720D-S1 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105720D-S1 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB389H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104581D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104581D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101009D |