VA HB400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Replacement of trees during development process; Chesapeake Bay watershed. Authorizes any locality in the Chesapeake Bay watershed to adopt an ordinance providing for the planting and replacement of trees during the land development process. Current law only allows a locality with a population density of at least 75 persons per square mile to adopt such an ordinance. The bill authorizes such an ordinance to exceed the requirements set out in the section.
Title
Chesapeake Bay watershed; replacement of trees during development process.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102199D |