VA HB402 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Summary
Involuntary commitment petition; minors; withdrawal. Provides that a petition for the involuntary commitment of a minor shall be served upon the minor and the minor's parents unless the petition has been withdrawn or dismissed. Current law only provides that such petition need not be served if the petition has been dismissed. This bill is identical to
Title
Involuntary commitment petition; dismissal or withdrawal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB402ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-31 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Printed as engrossed 080222528-E | |
2008-01-30 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB402E | |
2008-01-30 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-25 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080222528 |
Same As/Similar To
SB68 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB402 |