VA HB407 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Open captioning at movie theaters. Requires all movie theaters, including outdoor theaters such as drive-in theaters, that have four or more screens and are open to the general public to provide open captioning at least twice per week on any film that is regularly shown, provided that open captioning is available for such film. The bill requires such movie theaters to provide notice to the general public regarding the availability of open captioning and schedule at least one viewing during peak viewing time.
Title
Movie theaters; open captioning to include drive-in theaters.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103277D |