VA HB414 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Land records; recording and indexing fees. Provides that no clerk of a circuit court shall assess separate recording and indexing fees for one document that contains two or more instruments that may serve independent legal purposes, including a record of a mortgage as a financing statement, unless the person presenting such document or instruments requests that such document or instruments be recorded and indexed in more than a single instance. The bill also provides that no recordation tax shall be required of a quitclaim deed between a grantor and grantee when no consideration has passed between the parties, provided that such quitclaim deed shows on its face that no consideration has passed.
Title
Land records; recording and indexing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102630D |