VA HB441 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Certificate of General Studies. Clarifies that credits earned in academic subject area coursework as part of the Uniform Certificate of General Studies shall be transferable to a four-year public institution of higher education.
Title
Uniform Certificate of General Studies; credits earned in academic subject area coursework.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 142 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB441ER) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-19 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-16 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101704D |