VA HB449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful hunting, fishing, or trapping; prohibition upon conviction. Provides that any person convicted of violating a hunting, fishing, or trapping law may also be prohibited by the court from hunting, fishing, or trapping for a period of one to five years.
Title
Unlawful hunting, fishing, or trapping; prohibition upon conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB449ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103450D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 1 | 338 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 530.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |