VA HB453 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Airport boards and authorities; funding transparency. Requires any (i) airport board or authority created by a locality or group of localities and (ii) public use privately owned airport that receives funding from the Department of Aviation or Virginia Aviation Board to keep records and submit a public report regarding the receipt and disbursement of such funds.
Title
Airport boards and authorities; transparency and accountability for use of Dept. and Board funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB453ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB453H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106357D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106357D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Ad Hoc Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101999D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 1 | 2.2:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 36 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |