VA HB493 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass; Prince George County. Adds Prince George County to the list of localities that may enforce a grass cutting ordinance on occupied property. The existing general provisions apply to vacant property only.
Title
Grass and weeds; authorizes Prince George County to require by ordinance to cut on certain property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB493ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-20 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102400D |