VA HB5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); taking or damaging of private property; public use. Provides for a referendum at the November 6, 2012, election to approve or reject an amendment that revises the prohibition on the enactment by the General Assembly of laws whereby private property may be taken or damaged without just compensation.
Title
Constitutional amendment; taking or damaging of private property for public use (voter referendum).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-14 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB5ER) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100100D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB5E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee | |
2011-11-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-11-22 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100100D |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)