VA HB502 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/12)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/12)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Receipt required for certain rental payments; upon request. Requires that a landlord provide a tenant with a written receipt, upon the tenant's request, whenever the tenant pays rent in the form of cash or a money order. This bill is recommended by the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Landlord and tenant laws; receipt required for payments in form of cash or money order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB502ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103058D |