VA HB508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of solar facilities. Provides that a property owner may install a solar facility on the roof of a dwelling or other building to serve the electricity or thermal needs of that dwelling or building, provided that such installation is in compliance with any height and setback requirements in the zoning district where such property is located as well as any provisions pertaining to any local historic or architectural preservation district. Unless a local ordinance provides otherwise, a ground-mounted solar energy generation facility shall also be permitted, provided that such installation is in compliance with any height and setback requirements in the zoning district where such property is located as well as any provision pertaining to any local historic district. Any other proposed solar facility, including any solar facility that is designed to serve, or serves, the electricity or thermal needs of any property other than the property where such facilities are located, shall be subject to any applicable zoning regulations of the locality. The bill requires that any ground-mounted solar energy generation facility existing as of January 1, 2018, be deemed a legal nonconforming use, with certain exceptions. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019, with respect to ground-mounted solar energy generation facilities. This bill is identical to SB 429.
Title
Solar facilities; local regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB508ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2018-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB508H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106085D-H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106085D-H1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103843D |