VA HB528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Juvenile Justice; placement of certain individuals in independent living arrangement. Permits the Department of Juvenile Justice (DJJ) to place in an independent living arrangement an individual who is between the ages of 16 and 21 and who was committed to DJJ immediately prior to such placement. The bill also permits the Department of Social Services to provide independent living services to such individuals who are placed in an independent living arrangement and to individuals who are between 18 and 21 years of age who, immediately prior to their commitment to DJJ, had been in the custody of a local board of social services.
Title
Independent living arrangement; DJJ, placement of certain individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 497 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB528ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB528ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102718D |