VA HB537 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Home Visiting Program established; report. Establishes the Home Visiting Program within the Department of Social Services to support pregnant people and parents with young children who face greater risks and barriers to achieving positive maternal and child health outcomes. The bill directs the Department to operate in accordance with the Virginia Plan for Home Visiting established by Early Impact Virginia, a consortium of government and private entities. The purpose of the Program is to (i) promote the health and well-being of pregnant people and parents, (ii) improve infant and child health and development, (iii) strengthen family functioning, (iv) promote school readiness, (v) reduce child maltreatment, (vi) promote economic mobility, and (vii) cultivate strong communities. The bill requires the Department to report biennially to the Governor and the General Assembly on outcomes for Program participants. Home Visiting Program established; report. Establishes the Home Visiting Program within the Department of Social Services to support pregnant people and parents with young children who face greater risks and barriers to achieving positive maternal and child health outcomes. The bill directs the Department to operate in accordance with the Virginia Plan for Home Visiting established by Early Impact Virginia, a consortium of government and private entities. The purpose of the Program is to (i) promote the health and well-being of pregnant people and parents, (ii) improve infant and child health and development, (iii) strengthen family functioning, (iv) promote school readiness, (v) reduce child maltreatment, (vi) promote economic mobility, and (vii) cultivate strong communities. The bill requires the Department to report biennially to the Governor and the General Assembly on outcomes for Program participants.
Title
Home Visiting Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105766D-H1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101884D |