VA HB567 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water and sewer services; deposit, lien. Authorizes (i) an owner of property who is the occupant or where a single meter serves multiple units or (ii) a lessee or tenant, provided he has written authorization from the owner, to establish water and sewer services in his own name. The bill provides for a locality or water authority to require a deposit of not more than five months of water and sewer charges. A lien may also be placed on the property under circumstances outlined when charges are delinquent. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Water and sewer authorities; may put lien on property for delinquent rates, etc., on real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB567ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (73-Y 20-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB567ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-07 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 19-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105737D-S1 (78-Y 19-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB567S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Motion to pass by for the day withdrawn | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Chair rules substitute by Senator Edwards out of order 12105761D-S2 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105761D-S2 (Edwards) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105737D-S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105737D-S1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103053D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB567E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (16-Y 5-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103053D |