VA HB574 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; cooperative procurement; stream restoration and stormwater management. Excludes the purchase of (i) stream restoration and (ii) stormwater management practices, and all associated and necessary construction and maintenance, from the prohibition on using cooperative procurement to purchase construction. This bill is identical to SB 688.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; cooperative procurement, stream restoration & stormwater management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB574ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB574H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106162D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106162D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104419D |