VA HB589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; diplomas; proof of education; method. Provides that each public institution of higher education and private institution of higher education may provide any diploma or other proof of education to requesting individuals or entities using the method that it deems most appropriate, in either electronic or paper form. The bill requires the State Council of Higher Education in Virginia to post on its website a statement in accordance with such institutional authority.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public and private; diplomas, proof of education.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB589ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102191D |