VA HB61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMV records; release of photographs. Provides for release by DMV of a hard copy image of any photographs of deceased persons who held driver's licenses or special identification cards when requested by members of the deceased person's family or the executor of his estate.
Title
Driver's licenses; release by DMV of photographs of deceased persons to family members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015) | |
2010-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 15 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-18 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB61ER) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-02 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Printed as engrossed 10100660D-E | |
2010-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB61E | |
2010-02-01 | House: Amendment by Delegate Toscano agreed to | |
2010-02-01 | House: Committee amendment rejected | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2009-12-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2009-12-28 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100660D |