VA HB646 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner and Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; reporting duties. Requires the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to submit an annual report to the Chairmen of the House Appropriations and Senate Finance Committees that provides information on the operation of Virginia's publicly funded behavioral health and developmental services system. The bill also eliminates the requirement that the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services report biennially to the General Assembly on the comprehensive interagency state plan for substance abuse services.
Title
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Commissioner of; duties and powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 686 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB646ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Carrico, Barker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Delegates: Aird, Orrock, Farrell |
2016-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-01 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 16105628D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB646S1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105628D-S1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105628D-S1 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101288D |