VA HB649 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-11 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-11 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Summary
Collection of annual license and registration fees in certain localities; civil remedial fees on certain drivers. Prohibits licensed motor vehicle dealers from collecting any additional license and registration fees imposed by the Hampton Roads Transportation Authority and/or the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. This bill is the same as
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; collection of annual license and registration fees in certain localities.
Sponsors
Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Clarke Hogan [R] |
Del. David Nutter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2008-03-14 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2008-03-13 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-13 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-11 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-08 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-26 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB649ER) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083558536-S1 (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB649S1 | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083558536-S1 | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083558536-S1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-22 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-22 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-21 | House: Speaker ruled floor substitute by Delegate Gear not germane | |
2008-01-21 | House: Floor substitute printed 082556572-H2 (Gear) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Speaker ruled floor substitute by Delegate Albo not germane | |
2008-01-21 | House: Floor substitute printed 080832404-H1 (Albo) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-17 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083821536 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB649 |