VA HB658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Enterprise Zone Grant Program; threshold for real property investment grants. Lowers the threshold for qualified real property investments under the Enterprise Zone Grant Program for distressed localities from $100,000 to $50,000 for the rehabilitation or expansion of a single building and from $500,000 to $250,000 for new construction of a single building. Under the bill, distressed locality is defined as any locality with an annual average unemployment rate that is one and one half times or more the state average unemployment rate.
Title
Enterprise Zone Grant Program; lowers threshold for qualified real property investments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103720D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB658 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB658+hil |