VA HB658 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
CTB allocations to Northern Virginia highway construction district. Limits transit, rail, and public transportation allocations by the Commonwealth Transportation Board to the Northern Virginia highway construction district to no more than 25 percent of total allocations.
Title
Northern Virginia highway construction district; CTB allocations.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102835D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Northern Virginia
Railroads
Transportation
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Northern Virginia
Railroads
Transportation
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB658 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB658+hil |