VA HB672 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Infrastructure Project Loan Fund. Creates the Virginia Infrastructure Project Loan Fund. The Fund would be administered by the Virginia Resources Authority. Money in the Fund would be used exclusively for the financing of landfill gas energy projects and sewerage system or wastewater treatment projects undertaken by a local government. The measure also specifies that a landfill gas energy project constitutes a "project" under the Virginia Resources Authority Act.
Title
Virginia Infrastructure Project Loan Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] | Del. David Toscano [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB672ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB672H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104965D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104965D-H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101531D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 198 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 199 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |