VA HB677 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Summary
Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002; public hearing prior to interim or comprehensive agreement. Provides that at least 30 days prior to entering into an interim or comprehensive agreement under the Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act, a responsible public entity must hold a public hearing on the proposals. Currently a responsible public entity is required to provide an opportunity for public comment, which may include a public hearing at the sole discretion of the responsible public entity.
Title
Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002; public hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB677ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Locke agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Rereferred to General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087784684 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB677 |