VA HB678 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority (IEIA) and the Commonwealth Research and Commercialization Fund (CRCF). Updates obsolete references to the predecessors of the IEIA and the CRCF.
Title
Innovation & Entrepreneurship Investment Authority & Commonwealth Research & Commercialization Fund.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] | Del. David Nutter [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB678ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-27 | House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100098D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |