VA HB681 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Home-produced or small farm-produced food products. Allows the sale of food products made from any fruit, grain, herbs, honey, meat, milk, mushrooms, nuts, poultry, seafood, or vegetables by a farm employing 10 or fewer people or by a private home, so long as (i) the sale is made directly to consumers and (ii) the product is labeled with the producer's name and address, the product's ingredients, and a disclosure statement indicating that the product is not subject to Virginia's food safety laws or regulations.
Title
Home-produced or small farm-produced food products; sale of products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102593D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2288.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5145.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |